Global Patent Index - EP 1842953 A2

EP 1842953 A2 2007-10-10 - Laundry washing machine with a device for dosing and/or distributing detergent and the like

Title (en)

Laundry washing machine with a device for dosing and/or distributing detergent and the like

Title (de)

Wäschewaschmaschine mit einer Dosier- und Abgabevorrichtung für Behandlungsmittel.

Title (fr)

Machine à laver le linge avec dispositif doseur et distributeur pour les produits de traitement.

Publication

EP 1842953 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07105831 A

Priority

IT TO20060258 A

Abstract (en)

A laundry washing machine comprises a device for dispensing washing agents that has at least one first compartment (11) and one second compartment (12), which are able to contain respective doses of washing agent, and a housing structure (19), in fluid communication with a washtub and designed to receive the aforesaid compartments (11, 12). The first and second compartment are defined by respective separate receptacles (11, 12), which can be removed from the machine independently of one another. In an area corresponding to an access opening of the housing structure (19) a wall portion (7) is provided, mounted movable between an open position, in which removal of the receptacles (11, 12) from the machine is enabled, and a closed position, in which the receptacles are inaccessible and kept by the hatch itself in a respective working position.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842953 A2 20071010; EP 1842953 A3 20090422; IT TO20060258 A1 20071008

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-02-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-12-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU