Global Patent Index - EP 1842981 A2

EP 1842981 A2 2007-10-10 - Roller blind with a guide element

Title (en)

Roller blind with a guide element

Title (de)

Rollladen mit einem Führungselement

Title (fr)

Volet roulant avec un element de guidage

Publication

EP 1842981 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07104884 A

Priority

IT PD20060127 A

Abstract (en)

What is described is a roller blind comprising a cassette (2) for housing a winding roller (3), on to which a blind fabric (4) is wound, an aperture (7) being formed in the cassette for the passage of the fabric in the unwinding and winding of the latter, the aperture (7) being delimited by a pair of opposing edges (7a,7b) extending in the direction of longitudinal extension of the cassette (2), and a front strip (6) which has a pair of corresponding edges (6a,6b) running longitudinally and opposed to each other and which is fixed to an end (4a) of the fabric (4) transversely opposed to the roller (3), the strip being movable to close the aperture (7) in the cassette when the fabric (4) is wound on to the winding roller (3) in an inoperative condition. The blind comprises at least one guide element (10) fitted in the cassette (2) in a position such that it interferes with the strip (6) in the approach of the latter to the cassette, as a result of the winding of the fabric (4) on to the roller (3), in such a way as to guide the strip (6) in the closing of the aperture (7), with the longitudinal edges of the strip (6) and the cassette (2) which face each other being engaged with each other, in opposition to the flexural deformation of the strip.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 43/02 (2013.01); A47B 61/06 (2013.01); A47B 96/201 (2013.01); E04F 10/0688 (2013.01); E04F 10/0692 (2013.01); E04F 10/0618 (2013.01); E04F 10/0677 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842981 A2 20071010; EP 1842981 A3 20110119; IT PD20060127 A1 20071006

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110720

2011-11-10 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-09-21 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-09-21 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU