Global Patent Index - EP 1842990 A2

EP 1842990 A2 2007-10-10 - Electronic access control device

Title (en)

Electronic access control device

Title (de)

Elektronische Zugangskontrollvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle d'accès électronique

Publication

EP 1842990 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07007093 A

Priority

US 74426806 P

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides for an electronic access control actuator that requires little energy to change between the coupled and decoupled states. The actuator can have levers that interact to bias the control actuator in the decoupled state. The actuator can be changed between coupled and decoupled states by The electronic lock can include a security feature that prohibits the electronic lock from changing between the coupled and decoupled states.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 55/06 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0692 (2013.01); E05B 47/0006 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01); G07C 9/00309 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842990 A2 20071010; EP 1842990 A3 20080326; EP 2290179 A1 20110302; WO 2007113010 A2 20071011; WO 2007113010 A3 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIMONSVOSS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2008-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081113

2008-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080609

2008-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07C 9/00 20060101ALI20071105BHEP

2007-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 55/06 20060101ALI20071105BHEP

2007-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 47/00 20060101ALI20071105BHEP

2007-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 63/04 20060101ALI20071105BHEP

2007-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 47/06 20060101AFI20071105BHEP

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU