Global Patent Index - EP 1842991 A2

EP 1842991 A2 2007-10-10 - Emergency stop terminal with combined indicator

Title (en)

Emergency stop terminal with combined indicator

Title (de)

Nottasterterminal mit kombinierter Anzeige

Title (fr)

Terminal de bouton-poussoir d'urgence avec affichage combiné

Publication

EP 1842991 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07007070 A

Priority

DE 102006016645 A

Abstract (en)

The terminal (1) has a mimic indicator (4) that indicates a direction indicating figure in an active condition. The indicator comprises two individual indicating units (5a, 6a), where one of the units indicates the direction indicating figure. The individual indicating units comprise a lamp that is controlled in a group by a control unit. The indicators emit multi-colored light, where color of the emitted light is correlated with a specific function of the indicator and operating condition of the terminal.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Nottasterterminal, welches eine lichtemittierende Anzeige aufweist, wobei die Anzeige im aktivierten Zustand eine richtungsweisende Anzeigefigur anzeigt. Die Erfindung betrifft darüber hinaus ein Nottasterterminal, welches richtungsweisende Muster anzeigt.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05B 17/10 (2006.01); H01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/22 (2013.01); E05B 17/10 (2013.01); E05B 65/108 (2013.01); G08B 25/12 (2013.01); H01H 3/022 (2013.01); H01H 13/023 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1842991 A2 20071010; EP 1842991 A3 20090701; EP 1842991 B1 20160928; DE 102006016645 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170629

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007015137

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP WENGER RYFFEL AG, CH

2016-11-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007015137

2016-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 832915 T

- Effective date: 20161015

2016-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2016-06-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160520

2010-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-07-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 65/10 20060101AFI20070802BHEP

2009-07-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 17/10 20060101ALI20090528BHEP

2009-07-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 9/18 20060101ALI20090528BHEP

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU