Global Patent Index - EP 1843018 A1

EP 1843018 A1 2007-10-10 - Silencer

Title (en)

Silencer

Title (de)

Schalldämpfer

Title (fr)

Silencieux

Publication

EP 1843018 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07104446 A

Priority

DE 102006016095 A

Abstract (en)

An inside plate (1) is placed in an exhaust system of an internal combustion engine and is connected to a housing (14) along its circumferential edge (2). The inside plate has three through-openings where lines carrying gas and airborne sound pass through when the muffler is installed. A circumferential section (4) of the first (3) and third (3") openings has a radial play with an inside pipe. In the area of the inside pipe, the inside plate has spring-elastic tongues (6,6a",6b") that form another circumferential section (7) of the openings at its free end (8) and connects with the inside pipe. An independent claim is also included for the connection between a plate and a pipe.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Schalldämpfer für eine Gas und Luftschall transportierende Leitung, insbesondere für eine Abgasanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine. Der Schalldämpfer weist ein Gehäuse (14) mit wenigstens einem Innenrohr (5) zur Gasführung im Inneren des Gehäuses (14) auf, sowie wenigstens einen Innenboden (1) zur Aussteifung des Gehäuses (14). Das Innenrohr (5) durchdringt dabei den Innenboden (1) in einer Öffnung (3). Erfindungswesentlich ist dabei, dass zumindest ein erster Umfangsabschnitt (4) der Öffnung (3) ein Radialspiel zum Innenrohr (5) aufweist. Darüber hinaus weist der Innenboden (1) im Bereich des Innenrohres (5) wenigstens eine federelastische Zunge (6) auf, die an ihrem freien Ende (8) einen zweiten Umfangsabschnitt (7) der Öffnung (3) bildet und fest mit dem Innenrohr (5) verbunden ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/18 (2010.01); F01N 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/083 (2013.01); F01N 13/1811 (2013.01); F01N 13/1838 (2013.01); F01N 13/185 (2013.01); F01N 13/1872 (2013.01); F01N 1/24 (2013.01); F01N 2260/10 (2013.01); F01N 2450/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 102004054441 A1 20060518 - EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843018 A1 20071010; EP 1843018 B1 20121017; CN 101050721 A 20071010; CN 101050721 B 20101201; DE 102006016095 A1 20071011; JP 2007278285 A 20071025; JP 5122851 B2 20130116; US 2007227812 A1 20071004; US 7617909 B2 20091117

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-12-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EBERSPAECHER EXHAUST TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO. KG, 73730 ESSLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Effective date: 20121017

2013-12-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EBERSPAECHER EXHAUST TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO. KG, 73730 ESSLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-12-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Representative's name: BRP RENAUD & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-12-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Representative's name: BRP RENAUD UND PARTNER MBB RECHTSANWAELTE PATE, DE

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-12-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Representative's name: BRP RENAUD UND PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-11-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Effective date: 20130718

2013-10-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Representative's name: BRP RENAUD & PARTNER, DE

2013-10-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130905 AND 20130911

2013-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130718

2013-07-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EBERSPAECHER EXHAUST TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG

2012-12-13 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Effective date: 20121213

2012-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2012-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 13/18 20100101AFI20120508BHEP

2012-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F01N 1/08 20060101ALI20120508BHEP

2012-05-08 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502007010704

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F01N0007180000

- IPC: F01N0013180000

2010-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100329

2010-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080410

2010-04-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU