Global Patent Index - EP 1843036 A2

EP 1843036 A2 2007-10-10 - Apparatus for controlling the temperature of fuel supplied to an engine

Title (en)

Apparatus for controlling the temperature of fuel supplied to an engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Temperatur des einer Brennkraftmaschine zugeführten Kraftstoffs

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le contrôle de la température du combustible fourni à un moteur

Publication

EP 1843036 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07251459 A

Priority

GB 0606777 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus (10) for controlling the temperature of fuel supplied to an engine is disclosed. The apparatus comprises a first inlet (20) for receiving fuel from a fuel tank; a second inlet (30) for receiving fuel returned from an engine; a first outlet (40) for passing fuel to an engine and a second outlet (50) for passing fuel to a fuel tank. A valve is also provided for directing fuel received from the second inlet (30) to one or both of the first (40) and second (50) outlets wherein the valve is arranged to vary the proportion of fuel directed to the first (40) and second (50) outlets. Varying the proportion of relatively hot fuel received from the engine via the second inlet (30) to be returned either to the engine and/or the fuel tank enables the temperature of fuel supplied to the engine to be controlled. The proportion of the fuel received from the second inlet (30) to be returned either to the engine and/or the fuel tank is preferably dependent upon the fuel temperature.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/0035 (2013.01); F02D 33/006 (2013.01); F02M 37/0052 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843036 A2 20071010; EP 1843036 A3 20090408; EP 1843036 B1 20110608; GB 0606777 D0 20060510; GB 2436854 A 20071010; GB 2436854 B 20101222

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-07-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007015012

- Effective date: 20120309

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2012-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120309

2011-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110608

2011-07-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007015012

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2009-12-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2009-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091102

2009-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091007

2009-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU