Global Patent Index - EP 1843040 A2

EP 1843040 A2 2007-10-10 - Method for operating an oscillating displacement pump and oscillating displacement pump

Title (en)

Method for operating an oscillating displacement pump and oscillating displacement pump

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer oszillierenden Verdrängerpumpe und oszillierende Verdrängerpumpe

Title (fr)

Procédé d'utilisation d'une pompe volumétrique oscillantes et pompes volumétriques oscillantes

Publication

EP 1843040 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07006624 A

Priority

DE 10615845 A

Abstract (en)

Method involves accomplishment of pressure compensation between the individual pump chambers (1,2), during the pre-compressions phase and prevention of pressure compensation between the individual pump chambers, during the subsequent conveying stroke. The two pump chambers are provided for each liquid and movable displacement body (4,5). One of the displacement bodies absorbs liquid during the actual conveying phase of the other displacement body. An independent claim is included for the oscillating positive-displacement pump.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer oszillierenden Verdrängerpumpe für die gleichzeitige pulsationsarme Förderung mehrerer Flüssigkeiten, mit für jede Flüssigkeit mindestens zwei Pumpenkammern (1,2) und darin beweglichen Verdrängern (4,5), von denen jeweils der eine Verdränger (4,5) während der tatsächlichen Förderphase des jeweils anderen Verdrängers (5,4) Flüssigkeit ansaugt, am Ende des Saughubes seine Bewegungsrichtung umkehrt, die in die zugehörige Pumpenkammer (1,2) eingesaugte Flüssigkeit in einer Vorkompressionsphase vorkomprimiert und bei Erreichen eines vorgebbaren Vorkompressionsdruckes zum Stillstand kommt und so lange im Stillstand verbleibt, bis der andere Verdränger (5,4) seine Flüssigkeitsförderung beendet hat und danach an diese Förderung anschließend seinerseits mit der Förderung beginnt. Während der Vorkompressionsphase wird ein Druckausgleich zwischen den einzelnen Pumpenkammern (1,2) durchgeführt und während des anschließenden Förderhubes wird ein Druckausgleich zwischen den einzelnen Pumpenkammern (1,2) verhindert.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 11/00 (2006.01); F04B 9/117 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 11/005 (2013.01); F04B 9/1172 (2013.01); F04B 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843040 A2 20071010; EP 1843040 A3 20090311; EP 1843040 B1 20100421; DE 502007003483 D1 20100602; DK 1843040 T3 20100809

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170518

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170310

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110124

2010-08-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2010-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003483 P 20100602

2010-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2009-11-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2009-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090909

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-03-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 11/00 20060101AFI20070705BHEP

2009-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 9/117 20060101ALI20090128BHEP

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU