Global Patent Index - EP 1843043 A2

EP 1843043 A2 2007-10-10 - Vacuum pump with drive device

Title (en)

Vacuum pump with drive device

Title (de)

Vakuumpumpe mit Antriebsgerät

Title (fr)

Pompe à vide avec un appareil d'entraînement

Publication

EP 1843043 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07006199 A

Priority

DE 102006016405 A

Abstract (en)

The pump (1) has a drive device (11) comprising electronic circuits (16) for controlling a drive motor (9), which are arranged in an internal space (8), where low pressure prevails in the internal space. A separating unit has a printed circuit board (10), which separates the internal space from the surrounding. The printed circuit board includes a generating unit (12) for generating electric current and voltages in the internal space, where the generating unit includes a hermetically sealed connector or a stud soldered in a borehole of the board.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vakuumpumpe (1), die in einer Umgebung angeordnet ist, mit einem Gehäuse (2), einem Innenraum (8) und einem Antriebsgerät (11), welches elektronische Schaltungen (16) zur Ansteuerung von im Innenraum (8) angeordneten elektronischen und elektrischen Komponenten (9) enthält, wobei im Innenraum Unterdruck herrscht, mit einem Trennelement, welches Innenraum und Umgebung voneinander trennt. Um die Führung der elektrischen Signale in das Steuergerät einfacher und flexibler zu gestalten, wird vorgeschlagen dass das Trennelement eine gedruckte Schaltungsplatine (10) umfasst, welche Mittel (12) zur Durchführung elektrischer Ströme und Spannungen in den Innenraum aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2013.01); F04D 17/168 (2013.01); F04D 25/0693 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843043 A2 20071010; EP 1843043 A3 20140423; DE 102006016405 A1 20071011; JP 2007278278 A 20071025; JP 5303114 B2 20131002; US 2007237650 A1 20071011; US 8651838 B2 20140218

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150622

2014-12-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: HR

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2014-12-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2014-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20141022

2014-12-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 19/04 20060101ALI20140314BHEP

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 17/16 20060101AFI20140314BHEP

2014-04-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04D 25/06 20060101ALI20140314BHEP

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU