Global Patent Index - EP 1843100 A2

EP 1843100 A2 2007-10-10 - Apparatus and method for exhausting smoke with air outlet connected to a central mechanical ventilation system

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for exhausting smoke with air outlet connected to a central mechanical ventilation system

Title (de)

Rauchabzugssystem mit Luftaustritt angeschlossen auf mechanischer Belüftungsanlage, sowie Verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour l'évacuation des fumées comprenant une sortie d'air rattachée à une installation de ventilation méchanique centralisée

Publication

EP 1843100 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07075231 A

Priority

NL 1031508 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a device for exhausting air, comprising an exhaust device provided with an air inlet, an air outlet and connecting means for connecting the air outlet of the exhaust device to a central mechanical ventilation system (cmv) provided with a first fan of a building, with a second fan to enable a better exhaustion of air at the exhaust device than by means of the cmv, wherein means are provided for diverting at least part of the air flow from the air outlet of the exhaust device away from the connection to the cmv. The invention also relates to a connecting device for connecting an air outlet of an exhaust device to a cmv and to a building provided with such a device. The invention further relates to a method for connecting an exhaust device to a cmv.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/06 (2006.01); F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843100 A2 20071010; EP 1843100 A3 20120125; NL 1031508 C2 20071005

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LENTINK METAALWAREN B.V.

2012-10-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-01-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2012-01-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24F 7/06 20060101AFI20111216BHEP

2012-01-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24C 15/20 20060101ALI20111216BHEP

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU