Global Patent Index - EP 1843109 A2

EP 1843109 A2 2007-10-10 - Cooling System

Title (en)

Cooling System

Title (de)

Kühlsystem

Title (fr)

Système de refroidissement

Publication

EP 1843109 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07104133 A

Priority

JP 2006101980 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a cooling system capable of enhancing refrigeration efficiency even when using a carbon dioxide refrigerant. Namely, when an outer surface area of a high-pressure pipe is set to be in a range from 10% to 25% inclusive of a total inner surface area of a heat exchanging pipe of the evaporator, the coefficient of performance can be made large and the refrigeration efficiency can be enhanced.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/00 (2006.01); F25B 40/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/008 (2013.01); F25B 40/00 (2013.01); F28D 1/0477 (2013.01); F28D 7/022 (2013.01); F28D 7/04 (2013.01); F28D 7/106 (2013.01); F28D 7/14 (2013.01); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843109 A2 20071010; EP 1843109 A3 20090128; JP 2007278541 A 20071025

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-11-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-09-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU