Global Patent Index - EP 1843226 A1

EP 1843226 A1 2007-10-10 - Device for displaying time indication

Title (en)

Device for displaying time indication

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Zeitanzeige

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage d'une indication horaire

Publication

EP 1843226 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 06405153 A

Priority

EP 06405153 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an indication (7) carried by a rotary disc (8) that is arranged under a dial (1) of a timepiece. The timepiece has an opening (6) for permitting to make selective and successive appearance of the indication, where the indication is made of a fluorescent substance. A surface of the dial is located immediately near the opening and has a translucent zone (1a) for permitting to subject the substance to radiation of the light before the appearance of the indication through the opening, where the zone is made of flat polished sapphire.

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif d'affichage fournit au moins une indication horaire (7) à l'aide d'au moins un disque rotatif (8) portant lesdites indications horaires (7) et monté sous un cadran (1) d'une pièce d'horlogerie muni d'au moins une ouverture (6) pour permettre de faire apparaître sélectivement et successivement lesdites indications (7) qui sont réalisées à l'aide d'une substance fluorescente. La surface dudit cadran (1) située à proximité immédiate de ladite ouverture présente une zone translucide (1a) pour permettre de soumettre ladite substance fluorescente à la radiation de la lumière avant l'apparition des indications horaires (7) à travers ladite ouverture (6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/06 (2006.01); G04B 19/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/06 (2013.01); G04B 19/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 1474298 U 19391005

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843226 A1 20071010; EP 1843226 B1 20090311; DE 602006005613 D1 20090423

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006005613

- Representative's name: RACKETTE PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2017-07-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BULGARI HORLOGERIE SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BULGARI TIME (SWITZERLAND) S.A., CH

2017-07-14 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: BULGARI TIME (SWITZERLAND) S.A., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DANIEL ROTH ET GERALD GENTA HAUTE HORLOGERIE SA, CH

2017-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BULGARI HORLOGERIE SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DANIEL ROTH ET GERALD GENTA HAUTE HORLOGERIE S.A., MEYRIN, CH

- Document: DE 602006005613

2017-06-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602006005613

- Representative's name: RACKETTE PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2017-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DANIEL ROTH ET GERALD GENTA HAUTE HORLOGERIE S, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DANIEL ROTH ET GERALD GENTA HAUTE HORLOGERIE SA, CH

2016-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130407

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130407

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-02-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091214

2009-04-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602006005613 P 20090423

2009-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2009-03-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2009-03-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071221

2007-12-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SALEMI, JEAN-MARC

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU