Global Patent Index - EP 1843303 A1

EP 1843303 A1 2007-10-10 - ATM currency cassette arrangement

Title (en)

ATM currency cassette arrangement

Title (de)

ATM-Währungskassettenanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de cassette de monnaie ATM

Publication

EP 1843303 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07013062 A

Priority

  • EP 03808633 A
  • US 43763602 P
  • US 43763702 P

Abstract (en)

A currency cassette for an automated banking machine, wherein the cassette includes currency and the cassette includes at least one radio frequency information tag. Whereby the tag includes data representative of a characteristic of the currency and/or the currency cassette. When the currency cassette is introduced into an automatic bank machine, the bank machine reads the data from the RFID tag.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07D 13/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0012 (2013.01); G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07F 19/205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843303 A1 20071010; EP 1843303 B1 20160810

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170511

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-05-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60349257

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-02-02 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2599578 T3

- Effective date: 20170202

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2016-09-22 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60349257

2016-08-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1609054 P

2016-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2016-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2016-03-30 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160301

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080513

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080327

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WASHINGTON, JON

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VANKEULEN, ERIC

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEITHER, JEFF

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARKER, DAVID

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAGEE, PAUL D.

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MA, SONGTAO

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUROCY, KENNETH

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACKFORD, DAMON J.

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAEF, THOMAS H.

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLACKSON, DALE H.

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SPICER, GREGORY

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EASTMAN, JEFFREY

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JENKINS, RANDALL

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHRISTIE, JOHN

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DOMINICK, DOUGLAS

2008-04-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VANKIRK, THOMAS A.

2007-10-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1609054 P

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT