Global Patent Index - EP 1843369 A3

EP 1843369 A3 2009-02-18 - Entertainment machine button

Title (en)

Entertainment machine button

Title (de)

Unterhaltungsautomatenknopf

Title (fr)

Bouton d'une machine de divertissement

Publication

EP 1843369 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 07251508 A

Priority

GB 0606988 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1843369A2] An entertainment machine button comprising an outer member and an inner member arranged to move relative to the outer member, the inner member being arranged such that an upper region thereof covers an upper region of the outer member.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/12 (2006.01); G05G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/06 (2013.01); G05G 1/02 (2013.01); H01H 2223/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843369 A2 20071010; EP 1843369 A3 20090218; GB 0606988 D0 20060517; GB 0706687 D0 20070516; GB 2436968 A 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-12-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU