Global Patent Index - EP 1843429 A1

EP 1843429 A1 2007-10-10 - Spoiler in thermoplastic material that integrates electrical and electronic devices for automobiles

Title (en)

Spoiler in thermoplastic material that integrates electrical and electronic devices for automobiles

Title (de)

Spoiler aus thermoplastischem Material, in dem die elektrischen und elektronischen Vorrichtungen für Automobile integriert sind

Title (fr)

Déflecteur en matériau thermoplastique qui intègre des dispositifs électriques et électroniques pour automobiles

Publication

EP 1843429 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07006227 A

Priority

IT TV20060055 A

Abstract (en)

Accessory or component for vehicles, in this specific case, a back or front spoiler on the interior of which are housed the electronic and electrical devices necessary for the functioning of the relative communication apparatuses provided on board the vehicle and suitable for communicating with the exterior, and in particular wherein said receiver devices are provided with relative wirings gathered in correspondence with a specific area provided with at least one relative projecting pin, said pin being suitable for introduction into a corresponding socket provided in logical correspondence on the corresponding part of the vehicle where the housing and fixing of said spoiler is provided.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 21/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/3275 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3283 (2013.01); H01Q 21/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843429 A1 20071010; IT TV20060055 A1 20071004

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121011

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071227

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU