Global Patent Index - EP 1843502 A1

EP 1843502 A1 2007-10-10 - TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND TRANSMISSION METHOD

Title (en)

TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND TRANSMISSION METHOD

Title (de)

ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET MÉTHODE DE TRANSMISSION

Publication

EP 1843502 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06712284 A

Priority

  • JP 2006301068 W
  • JP 2005017304 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a transmission device capable of preventing increase of retransmission information or encoding redundant bit and improving a throughput in a MIMO communication method. In this device, an encoding unit (130) subjects data transmitted from a first transmission antenna (110) and a second transmission antenna (120) each formed by a plurality of antennas, to encoding processing all at once. Modulationunits (113, 123) modulate the data encoded by the encoding unit (130) for each of the first and the second transmission antennas (110, 120). Transmission units (115, 125) process the modulated data so that it can be transmitted from the corresponding first and the second antennas (110, 120). A transmission control unit (160) performs transmission control of the data transmitted from the respective antennas (110, 120). When retransmitting data, the transmission control unit (160) retransmits the data transmitted from a transmission antenna having a smaller number of antennas than the first and the second antennas (110, 120).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/06 (2006.01); H04J 99/00 (2009.01); H04L 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 1/06 (2006.01); H04L 1/16 (2006.01); H04L 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 1/1812 (2013.01); H04B 7/061 (2013.01); H04B 7/0632 (2013.01); H04L 1/06 (2013.01); H04L 1/1893 (2013.01); H04B 7/0691 (2013.01); H04B 7/0697 (2013.01); H04L 1/0023 (2013.01); H04L 1/0026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843502 A1 20071010; EP 1843502 A4 20120523; BR PI0607263 A2 20090825; CN 101107803 A 20080116; CN 101107803 B 20120222; JP 4926038 B2 20120509; JP WO2006080317 A1 20080619; US 2009042519 A1 20090212; US 7826871 B2 20101102; WO 2006080317 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121016

2012-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120605

2012-05-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04B 7/06 20060101AFI20120413BHEP

2012-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 1/16 20060101ALI20120413BHEP

2012-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 1/00 20060101ALI20120413BHEP

2012-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 1/06 20060101ALI20120413BHEP

2012-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 1/18 20060101ALI20120413BHEP

2008-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR