EP 1843531 A1 20071010 - Method for distributed multipath routing
Title (en)
Method for distributed multipath routing
Title (de)
Verfahren zum verteilten Mehrwege-Routing
Title (fr)
Procédé de routage distribué multichemin
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 0602901 A 20060403
Abstract (en)
The method involves connecting a router (R2) to a destination router (R5) for sending a stream of data packets to the destination router. Routing instructions, that indicate identities of the stream and an alternative path, are sent to the router (R2) and routers (R3, R4) located on the path. The instructions are stored in the router (R3), and one of the instructions is selected based on a priority rule common for all the routers. The selected instruction is executed, where the execution involves generating and storing routing information in a routing table of the router (R3). An independent claim is also included for a router connected via a set of links to other routers in a telecommunication network.
Abstract (fr)
Ce procédé consiste à : - dans un premier routeur (R2) qui a décidé de passer d'un routage mono-chemin sur un chemin (R2-R4-R5) dit par défaut à un routage multichemin, à envoyer une instruction dite de déviation, à lui-même et aux routeurs (R3, R4) situés sur un chemin alternatif (R2-R3-R8-R5) cette instruction leur indiquant au moins une identité de flux qui doit être dévié, et ce chemin alternatif (R2-R3-R8-R5), ce chemin alternatif devant être utilisé respectivement pour tous les flux ainsi identifiés, et n'envoyer aucune instruction concernant les flux qui doivent rester sur le chemin par défaut ; - dans chaque routeur destinataire (R3), à enregistrer chaque instruction de déviation reçue, et exécuter une instruction sélectionnée parmi toutes les instructions enregistrées, cette instruction étant sélectionnée selon au moins une règle de priorité commune pour tous les routeurs du réseau, l'exécution des instructions de déviation étant synchronisée dans tous les noeuds du réseau, et cette exécution consistant à générer des informations de routage et les inscrire dans la table de routage du routeur considéré.
IPC 8 full level
H04L 12/56 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H04L 45/24 (2013.01); H04L 45/243 (2022.05)
Citation (search report)
- [A] J. KANG, B. NATH, Y. ZHANG, AND S. YU: "Adaptive Resource Control Scheme to Alleviate Congestion in Sensor Networks", BROADNETS 2004, 25 October 2004 (2004-10-25), San José,California,USA, XP002415491, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.broadnets.org/2004/workshop-papers/Basenets/Shi.pdf> [retrieved on 20070117]
- [A] GOJMERAC I ET AL: "Adaptive multipath routing for dynamic traffic engineering", GLOBECOM'03. 2003 - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. SAN FRANCISCO, DEC. 1 - 5, 2003, IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, vol. VOL. 7 OF 7, 1 December 2003 (2003-12-01), pages 3058 - 3062, XP010678222, ISBN: 0-7803-7974-8
- [A] AKAR N ET AL: "A reordering-free multipath traffic engineering architecture for diffserv-MPLS networks", IP OPERATIONS & MANAGEMENT, 2003. (IPOM 2003). 3RD IEEE WORKSHOP ON OCT. 1-3, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, 1 October 2003 (2003-10-01), pages 107 - 113, XP010672856, ISBN: 0-7803-8199-8
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1843531 A1 20071010; FR 2899414 A1 20071005; FR 2899414 B1 20080516
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 07105466 A 20070402; FR 0602901 A 20060403