Global Patent Index - EP 1843639 A1

EP 1843639 A1 2007-10-10 - LED car lamp apparatus

Title (en)

LED car lamp apparatus

Title (de)

LED-Fahrzeuglampe-vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil pour une lampe de véhicule à LEDs

Publication

EP 1843639 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06007263 A

Priority

EP 06007263 A

Abstract (en)

A light emitting diode car lamp apparatus includes a light emitting module coupled to a power supply unit and having a plurality of light emitting diode units connected in parallel with each other, and each light emitting diode unit includes a plurality of light emitting diodes connected in series with each other, and the light emitting diode car lamp apparatus also includes a control circuit installed between the power supply unit and the light emitting module and setting a tolerance, and the control circuit detects the light emitting module to obtain a detected value, such that the control circuit will disconnect the power supply of the light emitting module, if the detected value does not match the tolerance.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0827 (2013.01); H05B 33/0893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843639 A1 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090324

2008-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080624

2008-06-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071017

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU