Global Patent Index - EP 1843642 A2

EP 1843642 A2 2007-10-10 - Device for remote control of lighting sources.

Title (en)

Device for remote control of lighting sources.

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Fernbedienung von SW-Beleuchtungsquellen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande à distance de sources d'éclairage.

Publication

EP 1843642 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07364005 A

Priority

FR 0603014 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a micromodule transmitter (2) connected on a wall switch (5) e.g. push-button switch, for transmitting a radioelectric coded control signal e.g. radio frequency signal, to a support on the switch. A micromodule receiver (1) is mounted in a series manner between a source of a supply voltage and a light source e.g. lamp (3). A load detecting unit is connected to a receiving microcontroller for detecting the presence and absence of the source. The receiver transits to a recording mode when the receiver receives a main coded control signal transmitted by a main remote control (6).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de commande à distance de sources d'éclairage comprenant au moins un micromodule émetteur se branchant sur un interrupteur standard, coopérant avec un micromodule récepteur monté en série entre une source de tension secteur et la source d'éclairage, et comportant un microcontrôleur apte à enregistrer un micromodule émetteur dans un mode enregistrement, et à piloter dans un mode opérationnel des moyens de commutation pour éteindre ou allumer la source d'éclairage sur réception d'un signal de commande codé d'un micromodule émetteur enregistré, et des moyens de placement en mode enregistrement comprenant des moyens de détection de charge, intégrés dans le micromodule récepteur (1) détectant l'absence et/ou la présence d'une source d'éclairage (3), et/ou au moins une télécommande principale (6) de courte portée apte à émettre au moins un signal de commande principal codé, à la réception duquel le microcontrôleur passe en mode enregistrement.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/0272 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1843642 A2 20071010; EP 1843642 A3 20100217; FR 2899762 A1 20071012; FR 2899762 B1 20080627

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100818

2010-12-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-10-20 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ODISLOR INNOVATION

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU