Global Patent Index - EP 1843670 A1

EP 1843670 A1 2007-10-17 - FILTER CIGARETTE

Title (en)

FILTER CIGARETTE

Title (de)

FILTERCIGARETTE

Title (fr)

CIGARETTE FILTRE

Publication

EP 1843670 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06700443 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000326 W
  • DE 102005005175 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2596475C] In a filter cigarette having a tobacco strand, a wrapping and a filter, the filter possesses at least one gas phase-active filter part which contains at least one gas phase-reducing substance. The gas phase-reducing substances are embedded in a filter material matrix. They are introduced in a quantity of at least 75 mg per filter and at least 5 mg/mm of the length of the gas phase--active filter part. The filter cigarette exhibits a filter ventilation of at most 30% (or of from 30% to 70%). The NFDPM value is between 4 and 10 mg/cigarette (or in the range of from 2 to 4 mg/Cigarette), as measured in accordance with ISO smoking conditions. The gas phase quotient Q1, defined as (µg of benzene per cigarette)/(mg of CO per cigarette) and measured in accordance with ISO smoking conditions, is less than 1.5, preferably less than 1.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • WO 02069745 A1 20020912 - PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US], et al
  • WO 9805226 A1 19980212 - WILLIAMS JONNIE R [US]
  • US 2009020132 A1 20090122 - PETERS GUNTHER [DE], et al
  • WO 0049901 A2 20000831 - REEMTSMA H F & PH [DE], et al
  • US 5168884 A 19921208 - BALDWIN SHERYL D [US], et al
  • CHEN P.X. ET AL: "Mainstream Smoke Chemical Analyses for 2R4F Kentucky Reference Cigarette", CONTRIBUTIONS TO TOBACCO RESEARCH, vol. 20, no. 7, November 2003 (2003-11-01), pages 448 - 458, XP003024851
  • NORMAN V.: "The Effect of Perforated Tipping Paper on the Yield of Various Smoke Components.", BEITRÄGE ZUR TABAKSFORSCHUNG, vol. 7, no. 5, September 1974 (1974-09-01), pages 282 - 287, XP003030370
  • Import Tobacco Catalog, April 2003 (Front cover and Back cover) and its English translation.
  • See also references of WO 2006081931A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005005175 A1 20060810; AU 2006209977 A1 20060810; AU 2006209977 B2 20110407; BR PI0606759 A2 20090714; CA 2596475 A1 20060810; CA 2596475 C 20130305; CN 101150964 A 20080326; CN 101150964 B 20110608; DK 1843670 T3 20121210; EP 1843670 A1 20071017; EP 1843670 B1 20120822; ES 2391831 T3 20121130; HK 1107746 A1 20130208; JP 2008528011 A 20080731; JP 5161585 B2 20130313; KR 101319697 B1 20131017; KR 20070096027 A 20071001; MX 2007009298 A 20080111; NZ 556708 A 20100226; PT 1843670 E 20121127; RU 2007132877 A 20090310; RU 2378959 C2 20100120; SI 1843670 T1 20121231; TW 200638886 A 20061116; TW I336247 B 20110121; UA 88351 C2 20091012; US 2009020132 A1 20090122; US 8439046 B2 20130514; WO 2006081931 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170103

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170104

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170102

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-02-28 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-08-14 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502006011882

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-07-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121122

2013-07-29 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E016047

2013-07-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A.

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-06-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: JT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-04-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-03-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20120402642

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-02-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-02-08 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1107746

2013-02-04 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 12822

2013-01-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121222

2013-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-01-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-01-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2013-01-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20120822

2012-12-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-11-30 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2391831 T3

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-27 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20121113

2012-10-24 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-10-18 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006011882

- Effective date: 20121018

2012-09-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 571420 T

- Effective date: 20120915

2012-09-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-08-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20081203

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-18 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1107746

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR