Global Patent Index - EP 1843704 A1

EP 1843704 A1 2007-10-17 - DEVICE FOR CONTACT MOLECULAR SAMPLING

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTACT MOLECULAR SAMPLING

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR MOLEKULARE KONTAKTABTASTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRELEVEMENT MOLECULAIRE PAR CONTACT

Publication

EP 1843704 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 06709471 A

Priority

  • FR 2006050089 W
  • FR 0550303 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2881339A1] The device has a support (12) comprising a side (14) that is opposite to a side (16). The support has capture zones provided on respective sides of the support and separated by interval zones. The zones (20) on the side (16) of the support are aligned and in opposition with the zones of the side (14) of the support. Developed surface of each zone is three times greater than the plane surface of the zones. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a sampling system comprising a biological interest molecule sampling device (2) a method for cartography of a tissue.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 10/02 (2013.01); A61B 10/0291 (2013.01); A61B 10/04 (2013.01); A61B 2010/0216 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006082344A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2881339 A1 20060804; FR 2881339 B1 20090710; EP 1843704 A1 20071017; JP 2008528224 A 20080731; JP 2012166041 A 20120906; JP 5265795 B2 20130814; US 2010049083 A1 20100225; US 8152736 B2 20120410; WO 2006082344 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20170112

2017-01-12 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2014-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140829

2010-05-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COSNIER, MARIE-LINE

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARTIN, FRANCK

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CAILLAT, PATRICE

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070720

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR