Global Patent Index - EP 1843739 A1

EP 1843739 A1 2007-10-17 - TOOTHPASTE COMPOSITION

Title (en)

TOOTHPASTE COMPOSITION

Title (de)

ZAHNPASTAZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE DENTIFRICE

Publication

EP 1843739 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05823840 A

Priority

  • EP 2005014058 W
  • IN 118MU2005 A
  • IN 289KO2005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006081867A1] A toothpaste composition comprising an inner phase disposed substantially coaxially within an outer phase, the inner phase constituting from 60 to 99.9% by volume of the composition, the outer phase being a gel and constituting from 0.1 to 40% by volume of the composition.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/25 (2006.01); A61Q 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/03 (2013.01); A61K 8/25 (2013.01); A61Q 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006081867A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006081867 A1 20060810; BR PI0519870 A2 20090324; EP 1843739 A1 20071017; MX 2007009239 A 20070919

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100529

2009-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

2009-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

2008-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080424

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070625

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR