Global Patent Index - EP 1843777 A2

EP 1843777 A2 2007-10-17 - HIV-1 gp41 FUSION PEPTIDES FOR IMMUNOMODULATION

Title (en)

HIV-1 gp41 FUSION PEPTIDES FOR IMMUNOMODULATION

Title (de)

HIV-1-GP41-FUSIONSPEPTIDE ZUR IMMUNMODULATION

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES DE FUSION VIH-1 GP41 POUR UNE IMMUNOMODULATION

Publication

EP 1843777 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06701338 A

Priority

  • IL 2006000096 W
  • US 64560505 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077601A2] The present invention provides pharmaceutical compositions and methods for prevention or treatment of autoimmune diseases and other T cell mediated inflammatory diseases and conditions, which comprise as an active ingredient an effective quantity of a peptide derived from HIV gp41 fusion peptide domain or fragments, analogs, homologs and derivatives thereof. The invention further provides novel peptides derived from HIV gp41 fusion peptide domain, useful in the treatment of T cell mediated pathologies.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 38/162 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077601A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006077601 A2 20060727; WO 2006077601 A3 20061123; AU 2006207181 A1 20060727; CA 2595414 A1 20060727; CN 101115498 A 20080130; EP 1843777 A2 20071017; JP 2008528480 A 20080731; US 2009270312 A1 20091029

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120801

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD.

2007-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMEMT CO., LTD.

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070612

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR