Global Patent Index - EP 1843870 A1

EP 1843870 A1 2007-10-17 - APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING A FACE GEAR

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING A FACE GEAR

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PLANRADS

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE FABRICATION DE ROUE DE CHAMP

Publication

EP 1843870 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 05718384 A

Priority

IB 2005000913 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006082470A1] A precision grinding apparatus for grinding face gears having a gear table portion controllably driven for rotation about a central axis, and also being movable in a vertical plane along an axis in a controlled manner. The apparatus further includes a case hardened face mounted on the gear table portion. A grinding wheel mounted on the apparatus has controlled driven rotation about a central axis C, and is provided with a grinding surface of predetermined shape. The grinding wheel is movable in a controlled manner toward and away from the gear along a feed axis V, the grinding wheel being movable in a controlled manner in a tangential direction with respect to the gear and orthogonal to the feed axis along a tangential feed axis wherein the motion of the grinding wheel in the C, V and TF axes, and movement of the gear in B and W axes, is controlled by a central control means.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23F 15/06 (2006.01); B23F 21/02 (2006.01); B23F 23/08 (2006.01); G05B 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23F 15/06 (2013.01); B23F 19/125 (2013.01); B23F 23/1225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006082470 A1 20060810; CA 2581724 A1 20060810; CA 2581724 C 20101130; EP 1843870 A1 20071017; EP 1843870 A4 20080618; JP 2008519699 A 20080612; US 2008268750 A1 20081030

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140103

2012-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELIGEAR ACQUISITION CO.

2012-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOLPRECHT, GEORG

2012-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WHELDON, GARETH, A.

2012-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FISHER, DAVID, J.

2012-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUSSELL, ADRAIN

2009-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090608

2008-06-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080520

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070402

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR