Global Patent Index - EP 1843884 A2

EP 1843884 A2 2007-10-17 - CHUCKING SYSTEM FOR NANO-MANUFACTURING

Title (en)

CHUCKING SYSTEM FOR NANO-MANUFACTURING

Title (de)

AUFSPANNSYSTEM FÜR DIE NANOHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MANDRIN DESTINE A LA NANO-FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1843884 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06718240 A

Priority

  • US 2006001145 W
  • US 4742805 A
  • US 4749905 A
  • US 10820805 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006083518A2] The present invention is directed towards a chucking system, including, inter alia, a body having a surface with a pin extending therefrom having a throughway defined therein, and a land surrounding the protrusions defining a channel between the pin and the land. In a further embodiment, the body comprises a plurality of protrusions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/0002 (2013.01); B25B 11/005 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); B82Y 40/00 (2013.01); G03F 7/70691 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006083518 A2 20060810; WO 2006083518 A3 20070329; EP 1843884 A2 20071017; EP 1843884 A4 20081217; KR 101254042 B1 20130412; KR 20070102723 A 20071019; TW 200633114 A 20060916; TW 200633846 A 20061001; TW I277504 B 20070401; TW I291212 B 20071211; WO 2006083519 A2 20060810; WO 2006083519 A3 20090423; WO 2006083520 A2 20060810; WO 2006083520 A3 20090514

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-02-18 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2008-12-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03F 7/00 20060101AFI20081113BHEP

2008-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B28B 11/08 20060101ALI20081113BHEP

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BABBS, DANIEL, A.

2008-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHOI, BYUNG-JIN

2008-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHERALA, ANSHUMAN

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070827

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU