Global Patent Index - EP 1843902 A1

EP 1843902 A1 2007-10-17 - ARTICULATION-LOADABLE WRITING INSTRUMENT

Title (en)

ARTICULATION-LOADABLE WRITING INSTRUMENT

Title (de)

GELENKIG LADBARES SCHREIBGERÄT

Title (fr)

INSTRUMENT D'ECRITURE A CHARGEMENT PAR ARTICULATION

Publication

EP 1843902 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 05850577 A

Priority

  • FR 2005003235 W
  • FR 0500182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101098790A] A writing instrument (1) comprising a main body (2) extending in a longitudinal direction (10), a writing tip (6) which is essentially disposed at one end (2a) of the main body, a cartridge (8) containing ink, a rear body (4) having an elongate housing (14) extending in the direction of loading (12), wherein said housing receives the cartridge and has an access opening (16) enabling the cartridge (8) to be introduced into the housing (14) or to be withdrawn therefrom in the direction of loading (12), and means of articulation causing the rear body (4) to pivot in relation to the main body (2) about an axis of articulation (20) perpendicular to the longitudinal direction (10), between a loading position, wherein the access opening (16) extends away from the main body (2), and an unlocked position wherein the longitudinal direction (10) and the direction of loading (12) are substantially merged.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43K 5/14 (2006.01); B43K 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 23/12 (2013.01); B43K 5/005 (2013.01); B43K 5/02 (2013.01); B43K 5/14 (2013.01); B43K 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006075064A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2880583 A1 20060714; FR 2880583 B1 20070413; BR PI0519630 A2 20090225; CA 2594424 A1 20060720; CA 2594424 C 20120821; CN 100534809 C 20090902; CN 101098790 A 20080102; DE 602005006627 D1 20080619; EP 1843902 A1 20071017; EP 1843902 B1 20080507; ES 2306289 T3 20081101; JP 2008526559 A 20080724; JP 4943346 B2 20120530; MX 2007008306 A 20070911; US 2008138141 A1 20080612; US 7993068 B2 20110809; WO 2006075064 A1 20060720; ZA 200705551 B 20081029

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2016-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160128

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141221

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141221

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141221

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090210

2008-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2306289 T3

2008-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005006627 P 20080619

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2008-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-02-27 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070703

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT