Global Patent Index - EP 1843931 A1

EP 1843931 A1 2007-10-17 - STEERING MECHANISM WITH AN AIRBAG ARRANGEMENT AND OPERATIONAL METHOD THEREFOR

Title (en)

STEERING MECHANISM WITH AN AIRBAG ARRANGEMENT AND OPERATIONAL METHOD THEREFOR

Title (de)

LENKUNG MIT AIRBAGANORDNUNG SOWIE BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

DIRECTION DOTEE D'UN SYSTEME SAC GONFLABLE ET SON MODE DE FONCTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1843931 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06705917 A

Priority

  • DE 2006000189 W
  • DE 202005001908 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006081812A1] The invention relates to a steering mechanism consisting of a steering column, wherein several safety features are accommodated in a compact manner in an extremely small area and with little effort. The invention also relates to an operational method for said steering mechanism, wherein several safety functions are embodied in an alternate or simultaneous manner.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 1/10 (2006.01); B61D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/2035 (2013.01); B62D 1/105 (2013.01); B62D 1/181 (2013.01); B62D 1/192 (2013.01); B62D 5/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006081812A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006081812 A1 20060810; EP 1843931 A1 20071017

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110901

2010-10-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, HELMUT

2008-05-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080111

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR