Global Patent Index - EP 1843970 A1

EP 1843970 A1 2007-10-17 - MICRORESONATOR

Title (en)

MICRORESONATOR

Title (de)

MIKRORESONATOR

Title (fr)

MICRORESONATEUR

Publication

EP 1843970 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 06709462 A

Priority

  • FR 2006050078 W
  • FR 0550276 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2881416A1] The microresonator has a resonant unit (160) made from monocrystalline silicon, and activation electrodes (120, 121) positioned close to the resonant unit. The unit (160) is placed in an opening in a semiconductor layer (110) that covers a substrate (100). The electrodes (120, 121) are formed in the layer and leveled with the opening. The unit (160) is in the shape of mushroom whose leg is fixed on the substrate. An independent claim is also included for a method of fabricating a microresonator.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B81B 3/00 (2006.01); H03H 3/007 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/2405 (2013.01); H03H 3/0072 (2013.01); H03H 2009/02496 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079765A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2881416 A1 20060804; FR 2881416 B1 20070601; EP 1843970 A1 20071017; US 2009152998 A1 20090618; US 2010295416 A1 20101125; US 7858407 B2 20101228; US 8159109 B2 20120417; WO 2006079765 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120801

2011-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS (CROLLES 2) SAS

2011-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS SA

2010-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100518

2010-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS (CROLLES 2) SAS

2010-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS SA

2010-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ABELE, NICOLAS

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANCEY, PASCAL

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TALBOT, ALEXANDRE

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEGUENI, KARIM

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOUCHE, GUILLAUME

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SKOTNICKI, THOMAS

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MONFRAY, STEPHANE

2008-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CASSET, FABRICE

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT