Global Patent Index - EP 1844085 A1

EP 1844085 A1 2007-10-17 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING A HYDROGENATED BISGLYCIDYL ETHER AND A CROSS-LINKING AGENT

Title (en)

COMPOSITION CONTAINING A HYDROGENATED BISGLYCIDYL ETHER AND A CROSS-LINKING AGENT

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND EINEN HYDRIERTEN BISGLYCIDYLETHER UND EIN VERNETZUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION CONTENANT UN ETHER BISGLYCIDYLIQUE HYDROGENE ET UN AGENT DE RETICULATION

Publication

EP 1844085 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06701121 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000389 W
  • DE 102005003116 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN101107284A] The invention relates to a composition containing a hydrogenated bisglycidyl ether and a cross-linking agent, the hydrogenated bisglycidyl ether having formula (I), in which R represents CH3 or H, and is obtained by hydrogenating the aromatic nuclei of a corresponding bisglycidyl ether of formula (II). The degree of hydrogenation is > 98 %, and the cross-linking agent does not have any aromatic structural elements. The invention also relates to a method for producing a cross-linked epoxy resin during which the aforementioned composition is used. The invention additionally relates to cross-linked epoxy resins that can be produced by using said method, and to the uses thereof.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 59/24 (2006.01); C08G 59/32 (2006.01); C08G 59/40 (2006.01); C08L 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 59/24 (2013.01); C08G 59/1405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077081A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005003116 A1 20060727; CN 101107284 A 20080116; EP 1844085 A1 20071017; JP 2008528715 A 20080731; TW 200634041 A 20061001; US 2008139728 A1 20080612; WO 2006077081 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080402

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF SE

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071121

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070821

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR