Global Patent Index - EP 1844092 A1

EP 1844092 A1 2007-10-17 - METHOD FOR CLEANING SURFACES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CLEANING SURFACES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON OBERFLäCHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE DE SURFACES

Publication

EP 1844092 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06707770 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050321 W
  • DE 102005003308 A
  • DE 102005023801 A
  • DE 102005029745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006077239A1] The invention relates to a method for cleaning surfaces using aminoplastic foam pieces, produced from (a) open-cell aminoplastic foams with a density ranging between 5 and 500 kg/m<SUP>3</SUP> and an average pore diameter of between 1 ?m and 1 mm or (b) open-cell aminoplastic foams with a density of between 5 and 500 kg/m<SUP>3</SUP> and an average pore diameter ranging between 1 ?m and 1 mm, which have been treated: (b1) with an aqueous formulation consisting of at least one compound (b-1) comprising at least one hemiaminal or aminal group per molecule or at least one copolymer, which has at least one polymerised comonomer containing OH groups or ß-dicarbonyl groups or epoxide groups; or (b2) with at least one polymer (c-1) containing carboxyl groups and/or carboxylic acid groups that are solid at room temperature and that have a molecular weight M<SUB>n</SUB> ranging between 1,000 and 1,000,000 g/mol. According to the invention, the aminoplastic foam pieces that are used have an average diameter ranging between 0.1 mm and 50 mm.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/40 (2006.01); C08J 9/42 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/42 (2013.01); C08J 9/40 (2013.01); C11D 11/0041 (2013.01); C11D 17/041 (2013.01); C11D 17/049 (2013.01); C08J 2361/02 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24504 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006077239A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006077239 A1 20060727; BR PI0606431 A2 20170627; CA 2595297 A1 20060727; EP 1844092 A1 20071017; JP 2008537700 A 20080925; KR 20070096053 A 20071001; MX 2007008899 A 20070816; US 2008149137 A1 20080626

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090728

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF SE

2008-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071227

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070824

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR