Global Patent Index - EP 1844134 A1

EP 1844134 A1 2007-10-17 - USE OF POLYMERS BASED ON MODIFIED POLYAMINES AS ADDITIVES FOR DETERGENTS

Title (en)

USE OF POLYMERS BASED ON MODIFIED POLYAMINES AS ADDITIVES FOR DETERGENTS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON POLYMEREN AUF BASIS MODIFIZIERTER POLYAMINE ALS ZUSATZ ZU WASCHMITTELN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE POLYMERES A BASE DE POLYAMINES MODIFIABLES, COMME ADDITIF A DES DETERGENTS

Publication

EP 1844134 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06704249 A

Priority

  • EP 2006050409 W
  • DE 102005003715 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006079626A1] The invention relates to the use of water-soluble or water-dispersible polymers as additives for detergents. Said polymers can be obtained by the reaction of (a) polyalkylene polyamines, polyamidoamines or polyamidoamines grafted with ethylene imine, or mixtures of said compounds, (b) as desired at least bifunctional cross-linking agents, and (c) monoethylenically unsaturated carboxylic acids, salts, esters, amides or nitriles of monoethylenically unsaturated carboxylic acids, chlorocarboxylic acids and/or glycidyl compounds, the constituents (a) having an average molecular weight Mw of between 20 000 and 2 000 000, and the molar ratio of the hydrogen atoms on the nitrogen in constituent (a) to constituent (b) being between 1: 0.7 and 1: 0.9.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C08G 73/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 73/028 (2013.01); C08G 73/0213 (2013.01); C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/3788 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006079626A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006079626 A1 20060803; BR PI0607310 A2 20100316; CA 2591864 A1 20060803; CN 101107349 A 20080116; DE 102005003715 A1 20060914; EP 1844134 A1 20071017; JP 2008528745 A 20080731; JP 5322088 B2 20131023; KR 101233548 B1 20130215; KR 20070101354 A 20071016; MX 2007008430 A 20070815; US 2008194449 A1 20080814; US 7670389 B2 20100302

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120117

2010-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100525

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF SE

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070827

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR