Global Patent Index - EP 1844215 A1

EP 1844215 A1 2007-10-17 - CAMSHAFT WITH CAMS THAT CAN BE ROTATED IN RELATION TO EACH OTHER, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

CAMSHAFT WITH CAMS THAT CAN BE ROTATED IN RELATION TO EACH OTHER, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

NOCKENWELLE MIT GEGENEINANDER VERDREHBAREN NOCKEN FÜR INSBESONDERE KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

ARBRE A CAMES POURVU DE CAMES POUVANT TOURNER EN SENS CONTRAIRE, EN PARTICULIER POUR DES VEHICULES A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1844215 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06705777 A

Priority

  • DE 2006000038 W
  • DE 102005005212 A
  • DE 102005014680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7610890B2] The aim of the invention is to provide a reliable and inexpensive camshaft wherein the inner shaft and the outer shaft can be adjusted in a low-friction manner. For this purpose, a camshaft with cams that can be rotated in relation to each other, wherein at least one first cam (3) is rotatably received on the outer shaft (1), is permanently connected to the inner shaft (2) via at least one radial opening in the outer shaft (1). Means (10) for connecting a camshaft rotational drive are provided at the axial ends of the camshaft. The camshaft is also provided with a rotational drive (9) exerting radial supporting forces onto the camshaft.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/047 (2006.01); F01L 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/047 (2013.01); F01L 1/34 (2013.01); F01L 2001/0473 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34436 (2013.01); F01L 2001/3444 (2013.01); F01L 2103/00 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49293 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006081788A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005014680 A1 20060810; DE 202005021715 U1 20090702; DE 502006009155 D1 20110505; EP 1844215 A1 20071017; EP 1844215 B1 20110323; JP 2008530412 A 20080807; JP 5038908 B2 20121003; US 2008257290 A1 20081023; US 7610890 B2 20091103; WO 2006081788 A1 20060810; WO 2006081788 A9 20070823

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-01-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-04-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006009155

- Effective date: 20111227

2012-02-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111227

2011-05-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006009155

- Effective date: 20110505

2011-05-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006009155 P 20110505

2011-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100219

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070716

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB