Global Patent Index - EP 1844272 A1

EP 1844272 A1 2007-10-17 - ICE-MAKING MACHINE

Title (en)

ICE-MAKING MACHINE

Title (de)

EISBEREITER

Title (fr)

MACHINE A GLACE

Publication

EP 1844272 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05823795 A

Priority

  • EP 2005056296 W
  • DE 102005003238 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US8181471B2] An ice maker comprises a tray (1), which has at least one compartment (4) for molding a piece of ice, a frame (15), in which the tray is mounted to be pivotable about an axis (14), and a motor (22) for driving the pivot movement of the tray, which motor is mounted at the frame (15) to be adjacent to the tray (1) and transversely offset relative to the axis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25C 1/10 (2013.01); F25C 5/08 (2013.01); F25C 2305/022 (2013.01); F25C 2600/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006076976A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005003238 A1 20060727; EP 1844272 A1 20071017; US 2009126391 A1 20090521; US 8181471 B2 20120522; WO 2006076976 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130601

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEBSTER, CRAIG DUNCAN

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WRENCH, NATHAN

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEGER, BERND

2008-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ST QUINTIN THOMAS

2008-04-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEBSTER, CRAIG DUNCAN

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WRENCH, NATHAN

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEGER, BERND

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070824

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR