Global Patent Index - EP 1844274 A1

EP 1844274 A1 2007-10-17 - ICE-MAKING MACHINE

Title (en)

ICE-MAKING MACHINE

Title (de)

EISBEREITER

Title (fr)

MACHINE A GLACE

Publication

EP 1844274 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05817049 A

Priority

  • EP 2005056369 W
  • DE 102005003241 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2009113918A1] An ice maker comprises a frame (15), a tray (1) which is pivotable in the frame (15) about an axis and which has a plurality of compartments (4) arranged in a number of rows and separated from one another by partition walls (3), and a motor (22) for driving a pivot movement of the tray (1) about the axis, the motor being coupled to the tray (1) by way of an eccentric mechanism (25, 26, 28).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25C 1/10 (2006.01); F25C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25C 1/10 (2013.01); F25C 5/08 (2013.01); F25C 2305/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006076980A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005003241 A1 20060727; EP 1844274 A1 20071017; US 2009113918 A1 20090507; WO 2006076980 A1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101027

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100416

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEBSTER, CRAIG DUNCAN

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WRENCH, NATHAN

2007-12-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEGER, BERND

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070824

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR