Global Patent Index - EP 1844295 A1

EP 1844295 A1 2007-10-17 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SCANNING MULTIPLE OBJECTS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SCANNING MULTIPLE OBJECTS

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABTASTEN MEHRERER OBJEKTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR BALAYER PLUSIEURS OBJETS

Publication

EP 1844295 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05797288 A

Priority

  • EP 2005055351 W
  • EP 04024827 A
  • EP 05797288 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1650529A1] The arrangement has two object holders (4.1, 4.2) and light sources for generating light beams (5.1, 5.2) for each objects (1.1, 1.2) and comprising light receivers assigned to each light beam, where the objects are scanned at the same time. Two measuring heads illuminate the objects by using a common mirror system and sense a surface of the objects. Receiving areas of magazines are encoded for receiving the objects. An independent claim is also included for a method for scanning an object.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/245 (2006.01); A61C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006042852A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1650529 A1 20060426; CA 2584402 A1 20060427; EP 1844295 A1 20071017; US 2008062434 A1 20080313; WO 2006042852 A1 20060427

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110503

2008-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080724

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DST SWISS AG

2008-01-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070828

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR