Global Patent Index - EP 1844381 A2

EP 1844381 A2 2007-10-17 - STANDARD CMOS LOW-NOISE HIGH PSRR LOW DROP-OUT REGULATOR WITH NEW DYNAMIC COMPENSATION

Title (en)

STANDARD CMOS LOW-NOISE HIGH PSRR LOW DROP-OUT REGULATOR WITH NEW DYNAMIC COMPENSATION

Title (de)

RAUSCHARMER STANDARD-CMOS-REGLER MIT GERINGER ABFALLSPANNUNG, HOHER PSRR UND NEUER DYNAMISCHER KOMPENSATION

Title (fr)

REGULATEUR A FAIBLE DESEXCITATION, A PSRR ELEVE, A FAIBLE BRUIT, CMOS STANDARD AVEC COMPENSATION DYNAMIQUE NOUVELLE

Publication

EP 1844381 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06717728 A

Priority

  • US 2006000563 W
  • FR 0500890 A
  • US 11913005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006083490A2] A voltage regulator circuit (200) has a first amplifier stage (210) with input and output terminals, a feedback terminal, a pole-inducing transistor, and a compensating network coupled to the output terminal. A second amplifier stage (220) has an input coupled to the first amplifier output, first and second current mirrors, and a pass transistor.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/40 (2006.01); G05F 1/44 (2006.01); G05F 1/56 (2006.01); G05F 1/565 (2006.01); G05F 1/618 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/565 (2013.01); G05F 1/575 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006083490 A2 20060810; WO 2006083490 A3 20080320; EP 1844381 A2 20071017; EP 1844381 A4 20090225

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091009

2009-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-02-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090122

2008-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080328

2008-05-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05F 1/40 20060101AFI20080410BHEP

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05F 1/565 20060101ALI20080410BHEP

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05F 1/44 20060101ALI20080410BHEP

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05F 1/618 20060101ALI20080410BHEP

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05F 1/56 20060101ALI20080410BHEP

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-04-23 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080320

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AMRANI, HAFID

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CORDONNIER, HUBERT

2007-12-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RABEYRIN, XAVIER

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU