Global Patent Index - EP 1844414 A2

EP 1844414 A2 2007-10-17 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCT LEVEL PROJECTIONS OF PHARMACY PRESCRIPTIONS WITHIN PRODUCT THERAPY CLASSES

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCT LEVEL PROJECTIONS OF PHARMACY PRESCRIPTIONS WITHIN PRODUCT THERAPY CLASSES

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR PRODUKTNIVEAU-VORHERSAGEN VON APOTHEKENREZEPTEN INNERHALB VON PRODUKTTHERAPIEKLASSEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR REALISER DES PREVISIONS DE NIVEAUX DE PRODUITS POUR DES PRESCRIPTIONS MEDICALES DANS DES CLASSES THERAPEUTIQUES DE PRODUITS

Publication

EP 1844414 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 05853340 A

Priority

  • US 2005044396 W
  • US 64681105 P
  • US 29360505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006080989A2] Systems and methods for product level projections of pharmacy prescriptions within product therapy classes are provided. Average wholesale dollar sales amounts are obtained or estimated at channel/outlet/product-therapy levels. All of the average wholesale dollar sales amounts are converted to prescription data at channel/outlet/product-therapy levels using a correlation function. The correlation function is derived by correlating samples of total prescription data where available with corresponding average wholesale dollar sales amounts.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 90/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/328 (2013.01); G06Q 10/10 (2013.01); G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006080989 A2 20060803; WO 2006080989 A3 20080103; CA 2595219 A1 20060803; EP 1844414 A2 20071017; EP 1844414 A4 20100210

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-09-15 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100416

2010-02-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100112

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 90/00 20060101AFI20080122BHEP

2008-02-13 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080103

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU