Global Patent Index - EP 1844419 A2

EP 1844419 A2 2007-10-17 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING TRAILING DATA ADJUSTMENT FACTORS

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING TRAILING DATA ADJUSTMENT FACTORS

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON NACHSPANNDATEN-JUSTIERUNGSFAKTOREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER DES FACTEURS DE REGLAGE DE DONNEES TERMINALES

Publication

EP 1844419 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 05853341 A

Priority

  • US 2005044398 W
  • US 64681505 P
  • US 29359205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006080990A2] Timely projections of product sales for a reporting time period are S obtained by combining actual sales data received from reporting stores and estimated sales data for non-reporting stores. The projections are adjusted to account for trailing data, which may be reported after the end of the subject time period.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G06Q 30/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006080990 A2 20060803; WO 2006080990 A3 20070531; CA 2595367 A1 20060803; EP 1844419 A2 20071017; EP 1844419 A4 20090902

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130524

2010-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091223

2009-09-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-09-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 30/00 20060101AFI20090730BHEP

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU