Global Patent Index - EP 1844436 A2

EP 1844436 A2 2007-10-17 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING PRESCRIPTIONS TO NON-REPORTING OUTLETS

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING PRESCRIPTIONS TO NON-REPORTING OUTLETS

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERGEBEN VON REZEPTEN AN NICHTMELDENDE VERKAUFSSTELLEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR ATTRIBUER DES PRESCRIPTIONS A DES POINTS DE VENTE N'ETABLISSANT PAS DE RAPPORT

Publication

EP 1844436 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 05853342 A

Priority

  • US 2005044399 W
  • US 64681405 P
  • US 29360205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006080991A2] A method for predicting market information for a plurality of pharmaceutical outlets includes the steps of receiving first data representing purchases and sales of at least one pharmaceutical product from at least one pharmaceutical outlet over a time period in the past, calculating the amount of prescriptions that are not reported in a timely manner at a product-level, computing a product-level projection factor for the at least one pharmaceutical product and using the product level projection factor to estimate the unreported amount of prescriptions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006080991 A2 20060803; WO 2006080991 A3 20071101; CA 2595371 A1 20060803; EP 1844436 A2 20071017; EP 1844436 A4 20100317

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150915

2015-09-15 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-03-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100212

2010-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 30/00 20060101AFI20100208BHEP

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-19 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070816

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU