Global Patent Index - EP 1844493 A1

EP 1844493 A1 2007-10-17 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING INTEGRATED CIRCUITS PROVIDED WITH SILICON- GERMANIUM HETERO-BIPOLAR TRANSISTORS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING INTEGRATED CIRCUITS PROVIDED WITH SILICON- GERMANIUM HETERO-BIPOLAR TRANSISTORS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG INTEGRIERTER SCHALTKREISE MIT SILIZIUM- GERMANIUM-HETEROBIPOLARTRANSISTOREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CIRCUITS INTEGRES AYANT DES TRANSISTORS HETEROBIPOLAIRES SILICIUM-GERMANIUM

Publication

EP 1844493 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06704267 A

Priority

  • EP 2006000711 W
  • DE 102005004707 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006081987A1] The invention relates to a method of producing integrated circuits provided with silicon-germanium hetero-bipolar transistors. A collector semiconductor area is produced, wherein an etching stop layer is produced on a connecting region and an opening is introduced into said etching stop layer. Semi-conductor material is applied over the etching stop layer and over the opening and is monocrystalline at least in the collector semiconductor area above the opening. A masking layer is applied to the semiconductor material prior to etching the semiconductor material above the collector semiconductor area, said masking layer protecting the collector semiconductor area prior to etching. Subsequently, the semiconductor material is etched until the etching stop layer is reached. Said etching stop layer stops etching when a defining surface between the semiconductor material and the etching stop layer is detected during etching and etching is stopped according to said detection.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/331 (2006.01); H01L 29/737 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 29/66242 (2013.01); H01L 29/7378 (2013.01); H01L 21/8249 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006081987A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005004707 A1 20060810; DE 102005004707 B4 20090409; EP 1844493 A1 20071017; US 2008081425 A1 20080403; US 7459368 B2 20081202; WO 2006081987 A1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-25 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090113

2008-05-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-05-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2008-05-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2008-01-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR