Global Patent Index - EP 1844544 A2

EP 1844544 A2 2007-10-17 - DEMODULATOR AND MODULATOR/DEMODULATOR BY DIRECT FREQUENCY CONVERSION

Title (en)

DEMODULATOR AND MODULATOR/DEMODULATOR BY DIRECT FREQUENCY CONVERSION

Title (de)

DEMODULATOR UND MODULATOR/DEMODULATOR DURCH DIREKTFREQUENZUMSETZUNG

Title (fr)

DEMODULATEUR ET MODULATEUR-DEMODULATEUR PAR CONVERSION DIRECTE DE FREQUENCE

Publication

EP 1844544 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 05809116 A

Priority

  • FR 2005002476 W
  • FR 0410644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7890081B2] The demodulator by direct frequency conversion comprises a vector addition device having: a first circuit (1) that furnishes, starting from a first AC signal (LO), a respective AC signal to n outputs that are not all of the same amplitude and of the same frequency, but are out of phase with regard to one another in such a manner that each one is not either in phase nor in opposite phase with any other; a second circuit (2) that splits a second AC signal (RFin) toward n outputs; a number n of summers (3a, 3b, 3c) each receiving, at the input, a respective output of the first circuit (1) and a respective output of the second circuit (2), and; a respective power sensor (4a, 4b, 4c) for each summer, whereby the number n is greater than or equal to 3. The demodulator also comprises digital processing means (5, 6) that furnish the result of the demodulation.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03D 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/30 (2013.01); H03D 7/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2006040453A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

FR 2876517 A1 20060414; FR 2876517 B1 20090410; EP 1844544 A2 20071017; US 2008064433 A1 20080313; US 7890081 B2 20110215; WO 2006040453 A2 20060420; WO 2006040453 A3 20070405

INPADOC legal status


2015-09-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150501

2014-06-18 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: GROUPE DES ECOLES DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS - ECOLE NA

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090415

2008-01-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUYART, BERNARD

2007-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RANGEL DE SOUSA, FERNANDO

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070828

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU