Global Patent Index - EP 1844603 A1

EP 1844603 A1 2007-10-17 - METHOD FOR SECURING THE COMMUNICATION LINKS AND THE ASSOCIATED CHARGES IN A REDUNDANT COMMUNICATION NETWORK

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SECURING THE COMMUNICATION LINKS AND THE ASSOCIATED CHARGES IN A REDUNDANT COMMUNICATION NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG DER KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNGEN UND DER ZUGEH\RIGEN VERGEB]HRUNGEN IN EINEM REDUNDANTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR ASSURER LES LIAISONS DE COMMUNICATION ET LES FACTURATIONS ASSOCIEES DANS UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION REDONDANT

Publication

EP 1844603 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 05822337 A

Priority

  • EP 2005013978 W
  • DE 102005003195 A
  • DE 102005007419 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102005007419A1] The method involves monitoring the functioning of terminals, an intermediator, and hardware units by a monitoring function. The functional hardware units (15) take up the physical functions of the failed hardware units (14). A message is transmitted to the terminals by the functional units. Characteristics of one of the failed units are transmitted to one of the functional units during an on-going transaction.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/14 (2006.01); H04L 12/24 (2006.01); H04L 29/14 (2006.01); H04M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 65/1006 (2013.01); H04L 12/14 (2013.01); H04L 29/06027 (2013.01); H04L 43/00 (2013.01); H04L 69/40 (2013.01); H04M 3/12 (2013.01); H04M 3/2254 (2013.01); H04M 3/248 (2013.01); H04M 7/006 (2013.01); H04M 15/00 (2013.01); H04M 15/56 (2013.01); H04M 15/63 (2013.01); H04M 15/8292 (2013.01); H04M 2215/202 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 102005007419 A1 20060803; EP 1844603 A1 20071017; US 2008130487 A1 20080605; WO 2006079411 A1 20060803

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080605

2008-04-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2008-04-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080118

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070824

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB