Global Patent Index - EP 1844684 A1

EP 1844684 A1 2007-10-17 - Industrial truck, in particular a high rack picking stacker

Title (en)

Industrial truck, in particular a high rack picking stacker

Title (de)

Flurförderzeug, insbesondere Hochregal-Kommissionierstapler

Title (fr)

Chariot de manutention, en particulier chariot de levage et gerbeur

Publication

EP 1844684 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07006880 A

Priority

DE 102006015979 A

Abstract (en)

A control platform for a fork lift truck for working in racking systems has a support base (4) for the operator and with a railing (20) facing the rack enabling the operator to reach over into the racks. For improved support and comfort two padded knee pads (26) are fitted to the railing via height adjustable supports to suit different sizes of operator. The knee pads can be secured to the control platform via pressfit connectors.

Abstract (de)

Flurförderzeug, insbesondere Hochregal-Kommissionierstapler, mit einer den Aufenthaltsbereich (2) für eine Bedienungsperson definierenden Standplattform (4), wobei an wenigstens einer Seite der Standplattform (4) eine Brüstung (20) vorgesehen ist, dadurch gekennzeichnet dass im Brüstungsbereich an einem Halter (28) wenigstens ein höhenverstellbares Kniestützelement (26) vorgesehen ist, an dem sich eine auf der Plattform (4) stehende und an der Brüstung (20) anlehnende Bedienungsperson mit den Knien abstützen kann.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 9/00 (2006.01); B66F 9/075 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/07545 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1844684 A1 20071017; EP 1844684 B1 20090826; CN 101049895 A 20071010; CN 101049895 B 20110504; DE 102006015979 A1 20071011; DE 502007001372 D1 20091008; US 2007235244 A1 20071011

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100402

2010-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100527

2009-12-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-10-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007001372 P 20091008

2009-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2009-08-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JUNGHEINRICH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2008-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080416

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU