Global Patent Index - EP 1844872 A2

EP 1844872 A2 2007-10-17 - Bending machine comprising a positioning and protection device

Title (en)

Bending machine comprising a positioning and protection device

Title (de)

Biegemaschine mit einer Positionierung- und Schutzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine de cintrage comportant un dispositif de positionnement et de protection

Publication

EP 1844872 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07105818 A

Priority

IT UD20060097 A

Abstract (en)

Positioning and protection device (10) for a bending machine (11), provided at least with a work plane (13) on which one or more metal bars (12) to be shaped are disposed and made to advance. The device (10) comprises at least a covering element (15, 16) having at least a first, operating position in which it extends longitudinally for a substantial part above the work plane (13) of the bending machine (11) and defines at least with the work plane (13) a sliding channel for the metal bars (12). The covering element (15, 16) is associated with movement means (22) able to move it selectively between the first, operating position and a second, discharge position, in which it lowers completely below, or at most flush with, the work plane (13), leaving it completely free.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/00 (2006.01); B21D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 11/12 (2013.01); B21D 43/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

HR RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1844872 A2 20071017; EP 1844872 A3 20080514; IT UD20060097 A1 20071014

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100407

2009-12-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BENDING MACHINE COMPRISING A POSITIONING AND PROTECTION DEVICE

2009-01-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-01-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20081113

- Countries: HR

2009-01-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20081113

- Countries: RS

2008-12-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081113

2008-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B21D 43/00 20060101AFI20070820BHEP

2008-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B21D 11/12 20060101ALI20080410BHEP

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU