Global Patent Index - EP 1844939 A1

EP 1844939 A1 2007-10-17 - Ink cartridge

Title (en)

Ink cartridge

Title (de)

Tintenkassette

Title (fr)

Cartouche d'encre

Publication

EP 1844939 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07105940 A

Priority

DE 102006017045 A

Abstract (en)

Ink cartridge (1) has a contact element (3) such that at least one contact of the printer device is brought opposite to a corresponding contact (8a) of a counter contact device (8) of the printer device while inserting into the printer device. The contact element is moveably arranged relative to the side of ink cartridge.

Abstract (de)

Tintenkassette zum Einsetzen in eine Druckervorrichtung, mit einem Kontaktelement (3) mit mindestens einem Kontakt (3a), der beim Einsetzen in die Druckervorrichtung mit einem entsp=echenden Kontakt (8a) einer Gegenkontakteinrichtung (8) der Druckervorrichtung in Gegenüberstellung zu bringen ist. Das Kontaktelement (3) ist relativ zu einer Seite der Tintenkassette (1) beweglich angeordnet und ist hierfür auf einem Träger (9;9b) angeordnet, der über ein Scharnier (9a) mit der Tintenkassette verbunden ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1752 (2013.01); B41J 2/17526 (2013.01); B41J 2/1753 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006017045 A1 20070419; DE 502007004367 D1 20100826; EP 1844939 A1 20071017; EP 1844939 B1 20100714

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007004367

- Effective date: 20110415

2011-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110415

2010-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007004367 P 20100826

2010-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080222

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU