Global Patent Index - EP 1845005 A2

EP 1845005 A2 2007-10-17 - Rail vehicle and rail traffic

Title (en)

Rail vehicle and rail traffic

Title (de)

Schienenfahrzeug und Schienenverkehr

Title (fr)

Véhicule sur rails et transport ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1845005 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 06090030 A

Priority

GB 0428485 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves fitting a frame with a cabin or container, in a vehicle. Guide-way slide devices are aligned to a guide-way run by a unit to adjust a position between the guide-way slide device and rails parallel before a guide-way contact. A movement of transport members is divided in such a manner which is effected by push and pull devices in a vertical plane and in a horizontal plane. A carrying cable is used instead of guide-way rails (22, 23).

Abstract (de)

Gleisgebundenes Fahrzeug und Verkehr, welche in ihrer platzsparendsten Ausführung durch eine zwischen Motorwagen befestigte Kleinkabine etwa für ein bis zwei Personen gekennzeichnet sind, die in einer Umrüstungskammer auch mit einem anderem Antriebsaggregat versehen werden kann, vorzugsweise mit Kufen für linearmotorischen Antrieb in einer teilevakuierten Röhre. Insbesondere für den flächendeckenden Nahverkehr wird ein individueller Schienenverkehr vorgeschlagen, bei dem mehrere Gleise treppenartig gestuft auf Pfeilern aufgeständert sind und durch Anhebung oder Absenkung eines Teiles der zusätzlich an der Kabine vom und hinten angebrachten Motorwagen und deren anschließender Seitwärtsverschiebung nach einander erreicht werden können, wonach auf dem ursprünglichen Gleis verbliebene Motorwagen auf die Höhe des neuen Gleises nachgeholt werden Die Vielfalt der Kombinationsmöglichkeiten der Schienen und Gleise ist hoch und schließt auch die Anwendung ebenerdig auf Schwellen verlegter Schienen nicht aus. Sicherungsmaßnahmen etwa bei Erdbeben oder Schienenbrüchen werden berücksichtigt und besonders auch der Modellbau für den Spielzeuggebrauch.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 15/00 (2006.01); A63H 18/02 (2006.01); A63H 19/15 (2006.01); B61K 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 15/00 (2013.01); B61K 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845005 A2 20071017; EP 1845005 A3 20080102; GB 0428485 D0 20050202

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100429

2010-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091218

2008-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080617

2008-09-17 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20080617

- Countries: AL

2008-09-17 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20080617

- Countries: HR

2008-09-17 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20080617

- Countries: MK

2008-09-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2008-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU