Global Patent Index - EP 1845045 A1

EP 1845045 A1 2007-10-17 - Transfer device for tissues, napkins and the like

Title (en)

Transfer device for tissues, napkins and the like

Title (de)

Übertragungsvorrichtung für Gewebe, Servietten und Ähnliches

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transfert de tissus, serviettes et similaires

Publication

EP 1845045 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07105719 A

Priority

IT BO20060290 A

Abstract (en)

A transfer device for tissues, napkins and the like, comprising at least one drum (3) which rotates about its own axis and is provided with retention means (4) which are adapted to retain products (2) such as tissues, napkins and the like so that they adhere to its outer surface (5) along at least one portion of its rotation, and at least one star conveyor (6) which is affected peripherally by a plurality of receptacles (7) for the insertion of the products (2) and for the release of the products (2) at subsequent production stations, the transfer device further comprising at least one element (8) for rotationally entraining the products one by one, which is arranged substantially between the drum (3) and the star conveyor (6) and is adapted to follow the insertion of each of the products (2) within the receptacles (7).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/40 (2013.01); B65H 29/243 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1924 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845045 A1 20071017; IT BO20060290 A1 20071015; US 2007241493 A1 20071018

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080418

2008-08-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2007-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANELLI, STEFANO

2007-11-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHELOSSI, SIMONE

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU