Global Patent Index - EP 1845046 B1

EP 1845046 B1 2009-02-11 - Feeder-folder apparatus with device for scoring the sheets

Title (en)

Feeder-folder apparatus with device for scoring the sheets

Title (de)

Falzanleger mit Vorrichtung zum Rillen des Bogens

Title (fr)

Chargeur de feuilles avec un dispositif pour former une rayure dans les feuilles

Publication

EP 1845046 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 06405154 A

Priority

EP 06405154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1845046A1] A paper processing assembly imparts a corrugated profile to a sheet of paper or cardboard. The assembly has a drum that draws a sheet from a stack and feeds it to a corrugation embossing station. The drum has a first fluted wheel (10) that intermeshes with a second fluted wheel. The second fluted wheel is coupled to a feeling roller (15) rotating and pressing against a surface (11) on the first fluted wheel (10). The feeling roller maintains a constant distance between the second fluted wheel and surface (11).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 50/10 (2017.01); B65H 45/22 (2006.01); B31B 50/25 (2017.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/22 (2013.01); B65H 45/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845046 A1 20071017; EP 1845046 B1 20090211; DE 502006002817 D1 20090326; JP 2007277012 A 20071025; JP 4860538 B2 20120125; US 2007254793 A1 20071101; US 7537557 B2 20090526

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180419

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006002817 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-10-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FEEDER-FOLDER APPARATUS WITH DEVICE FOR SCORING THE SHEETS

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU