Global Patent Index - EP 1845050 A2

EP 1845050 A2 2007-10-17 - Method for allocating a user to a lift installation and such a lift installation

Title (en)

Method for allocating a user to a lift installation and such a lift installation

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Zuteilung eines Benutzers zu einer Aufzugsanlage und eine solche Aufzugsanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé destiné à l'attribution d'un utilisateur à une installation d'ascenseur et une telle installation d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1845050 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07105801 A

Priority

  • EP 06112652 A
  • EP 07105801 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves delivering a target call by a user, and detecting and announcing a lift to the user by acoustical signals. Signals characterizing different lifts are exclusively formed by only one signal-frequency-signal tones. The different signals characterizing the individual lifts are distinguishably recognized by a pre-determined signal duration and/or a pre-determined signal interruption for the user, where the different signals are configured by a Morse alphabet code. An independent claim is also included for a lift installation.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Zuteilung eines Benutzers zu einer Aufzugsanlage mit mehreren Aufzügen gibt der Benutzer einen Zielruf ab. Daraufhin wird wenigstens ein Aufzug zur Bedienung des Zielrufes ermittelt und mittels eines den Aufzug kennzeichnenden, akustischen Signals an den Benutzer bekannt gegeben. Alle die unterschiedlichen Aufzüge kennzeichnenden Signale werden ausschließlich mittels eines einzigen Ein-Frequenz-Signaltones gebildet, wobei die verschiedenen, die einzelnen Aufzüge kennzeichnenden Signale durch eine vorbestimmte Signaldauer und/oder wenigstens eine vorbestimmte Signalunterbrechung für den Benutzer unterscheidbar erkennbar sind. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner eine zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens eingerichtete Aufzugsanlage.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 3/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845050 A2 20071017; EP 1845050 A3 20120208

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170725

2017-06-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170516

2013-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130212

2012-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120803

2012-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-02-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2012-02-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 3/00 20060101AFI20111230BHEP

2008-10-17 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1113921

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU