Global Patent Index - EP 1845148 A2

EP 1845148 A2 2007-10-17 - Use of an alloy in a process for hydrothermal gasification of salts containing reactants

Title (en)

Use of an alloy in a process for hydrothermal gasification of salts containing reactants

Title (de)

Verwendung einer Legierung in einem Verfahren zur hydrothermalen Vergasung von salzhaltigen Edukten

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un alliage dans un procédé de gazéification hydrothermique de produits contenant des sels

Publication

EP 1845148 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07004732 A

Priority

DE 102006017230 A

Abstract (en)

An alloy used as the inner surface of a reaction vessel in the hydrothermal gasification of salt-containing educts, comprises (wt.%): at least 25 iron; or at least 25 nickel; and not more than 0.1 molybdenum.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft die Verwendung einer Legierung, die mindestens 25 Gew.% Eisen oder mindestens 25 Gew.% Nickel und höchstens 0,1 Gew.% Molybdän enthält, in einem Verfahren zur hydrothermalen Vergasung von salzhaltigen Edukten, insbesondere bei der Vergasung von wässriger Biomasse in überkritischem Wasser. Durch die Verwendung von Reaktionsgefäßen, die zumindest eine Oberfläche aus diesen Legierungen aufweisen, wird die durch salzhaltige Lösungen verursachte Korrosion an den eingesetzten Reaktionsgefäßen effektiv reduziert.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/74 (2013.01); C10J 2200/06 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0916 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0979 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845148 A2 20071017; EP 1845148 A3 20101208

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110609

2011-10-13 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110822

2011-08-22 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-08-17 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KARLSRUHER INSTITUT FUER TECHNOLOGIE

2007-10-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF AN ALLOY IN A PROCESS FOR HYDROTHERMAL GASIFICATION OF SALTS CONTAINING REACTANTS

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU