Global Patent Index - EP 1845197 A1

EP 1845197 A1 2007-10-17 - Paving machine

Title (en)

Paving machine

Title (de)

Strassenfertiger

Title (fr)

Finisseur

Publication

EP 1845197 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06007860 A

Priority

EP 06007860 A

Abstract (en)

The finisher (F) has a chassis (1) with an operator`s platform (4), a carriage (2), and a material hopper in a front region of the chassis. A conveying device (8) is placed between the material hopper and a lateral distributing device (5). A spraying assembly (S) is provided for a bitumen emulsion, and includes a set of spraying modules (M1-M4), where one of the modules is provided on the platform to store and deploy the emulsion, and another module is provided to apply the emulsion in the inner width of the carriage. The spraying module has a spraying ramp (11) at the carriage.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Straßenfertiger (F) und einer Sprüheinrichtung (S) für eine Bitumenemulsion umfasst die Sprüheinrichtung (S) Sprühmodule (M1, M2, M3; M4), von denen das vierte Sprühmodul (M4) an jeder Seite im Bereich des Fahrwerks (2) wenigstens eine klappbare Sprührampe (14) umfasst.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2006.01); E01C 19/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/176 (2013.01); E01C 19/48 (2013.01); E01C 2301/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1845197 A1 20071017; EP 1845197 B1 20081029; AT 412800 T 20081115; CN 100590263 C 20100217; CN 101054788 A 20071017; DE 502006001938 D1 20081211; US 2007243017 A1 20071018; US 7488138 B2 20090210

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-09-19 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: CORRECTIONS ALLOWED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 28 NOVEMBER 2011 ALLOWED ON 28 APRIL 2012

2012-04-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JOSEPH VOEGELE AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOSEPH VOEGELE AG, 68163 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 502006001938

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001938

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-04-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001938

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20120217

2012-03-28 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Free text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 28 NOVEMBER 2011

2012-02-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502006001938

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2011-12-30 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-06-24 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-10-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090730

2008-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502006001938 P 20081211

2008-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2008-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2007-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061121

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2007-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU